Web3 Jun 2024 · The head of EPA is the administrator, a cabinet-level political appointee nominated by the President and confirmed by the Senate.EPA's administrator is responsible for managing and enforcing the nation's environmental laws and regulations, preparing the annual budget of the agency, leading U.S. government efforts related to the environment … Web14 Nov 2024 · Madeleine Albright (born May 15, 1937) is a Czech-born American politician and diplomat who served as U.S. ambassador to the United Nations from 1993 to 1997, and as the first woman to hold the cabinet post of U.S. Secretary of State, serving under President Bill Clinton from 1997 to 2001. In 2012 Albright was awarded the Presidential …
Cabinet Members During the Reagan Administration
WebPresident Reagan appointed Dr. Roberts Assistant Secretary of the Treasury for Economic Policy and he was confirmed in office by the U.S. Senate. From 1975 to 1978, Dr. Roberts served on the congressional staff where he drafted the Kemp-Roth bill and played a leading role in developing bipartisan support for a supply-side economic policy. Haig was the second of three career military officers to become secretary of state (George C. Marshall and Colin Powell were the others). His speeches in this role in particular led to the coining of the neologism "Haigspeak," described in a dictionary of neologisms as "Language characterized by pompous obscurity … See more Alexander Meigs Haig Jr. was United States Secretary of State under President Ronald Reagan and White House Chief of Staff under Presidents Richard Nixon and Gerald Ford. Prior to and in between these cabinet-level positions, he … See more Korean War As a young officer, Haig served as an aide to Lieutenant General Alonzo Patrick Fox, a deputy chief of staff … See more Nixon administration After only four months as VCSA, Haig returned to the Nixon administration at the height of the Watergate affair as White House chief of staff … See more Haig retired as a four-star general from the Army in 1979, and moved on to civilian employment. In 1979 he worked at the Philadelphia See more Haig was born in Bala Cynwyd, Pennsylvania, the middle of three children of Alexander Meigs Haig, a Republican lawyer of Scottish descent, and his wife, Regina Anne (née … See more In 1969, he was appointed military assistant to the assistant to the president for national security affairs, Henry Kissinger. A year later, he replaced Richard V. Allen as deputy assistant to the president for national security affairs. During this period, … See more In December 1974, Haig was appointed as the next Supreme Allied Commander Europe by President Gerald Ford replacing General See more onnxruntime c++ fp16
House Speaker McCarthy meets with Taiwan
WebGeorge Pratt Shultz (/ ʃ ʊ l t s /; December 13, 1920 – February 6, 2024) was an American economist, businessman, diplomat and statesman.He served in various positions under two different Republican presidents and is one of the only two persons to have held four different Cabinet-level posts, the other being Elliot Richardson. Shultz played a major role in … WebAlexander Meigs Haig, Jr. was appointed Secretary of State by President Ronald Reagan and assumed the office on January 22, 1981. He served a relatively short time in office, … WebRonald Reagan; George H. W. Bush; Bill Clinton; George W. Bush; Barack Obama; Donald Trump; ... Vice President: J. Danforth Quayle: Secretary of State: James A. Baker (1989–1992) Secretary of State: Lawrence Eagleburger (1992–1993) Secretary of Defense: Richard B. Cheney (1989–1993) Secretary of the Interior: Manuel Lujan (1989–1993) onnxruntime c++ batchsize