網頁She was previously Brand and Customer Experience Director at British Airways (2024-2024), Chief Customer Officer at Iberia (2015-2024) and Marketing Director at Iberia (2011 … 網頁2024年10月15日 · International Airlines Group’s (IAG) chief financial officer Steve Gunning has decided to stand down from his role and leave the group after the release of the company's full year 2024 results early next year. He will be succeeded by Nicholas Cadbury, who will join the ...
UPDATE 1-British Airways owner IAG names Whitbread
網頁2011年9月6日 · He will be replaced by Steve Gunning, currently chief financial officer at British Airways, whose appointment as a Board executive director will be proposed to the AGM. Willie Walsh, IAG chief executive said: “Enrique has done a fantastic job at IAG. 網頁2024年11月11日 · Gunning, who was CFO at the British Airways owner from June 2024 until October last year, is set to take over from current finance boss Marc Ronchetti, who … bosch wtmc3321us/05 repair manual
Stephen Gunning - Biography - MarketScreener.com
網頁2024年4月15日 · Steve Gunning has been British Airways CFO since January 2016 and acting director of IAG Global Business Services since December 2024. Before that he was chief executive of IAG Cargo from 2011. He joined British Airways in 1998, and before becoming managing director of British Airways World Cargo in 2007, was the airline’s … 網頁2024年10月15日 · Gunning ha pasado los últimos 20 años en las filas de British Airways y, posteriormente, en IAG. Ahora señala que es el “momento adecuado para buscar un nuevo desafío”. 網頁2024年10月16日 · October 16, 2024 0 210 British Airways owner IAG’s chief financial officer Steve Gunning is to leave after the release of the company’s full-year 2024 results next February, the airline group said today. His replacement, Nicholas Cadbury, is joining from Whitbread where currently he is Group Finance Director, having joined the group in 2012. hawaii designer shirts